White v. Prudential Life Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Carrie White
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela R. Lawrence on behalf of Prudential Life Insurance (Lawrence, Pamela)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Carrie White. (Claeys, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Carrie White. (Claeys, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carrie White. Prudential Life Insurance waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/27/2019. (Claeys, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Carrie White re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Claeys, John)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2610485. (jlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Prudential Life Insurance. (jlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe and Prudential Life Insurance, filed by Carrie White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Verification, and #8 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Prudential Life Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie White
Represented By: John P. Claeys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance
Represented By: Pamela R. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?