Jenkins v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Christine Jenkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00079
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/9/2019. (jlh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Jenkins. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit proof of service)(Martin, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Blanchard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Blanchard, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jlh)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/28/2019. (jlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Christine Jenkins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Christine Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #2 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jenkins
Represented By: Charles L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?