Blount v. Wells
Plaintiff: Obatala Blount
Defendant: Doctor Wells, Doctor Mulloy, Doctor Burks, James D. Smith, Alisha Hammock Evans, Kelvin Sprayberry, Jone Cims, Terrance Kilpatrick, Kathy Smith, Cindy L. Smith, Sharon Lewis, Andrew N. Young, Charles P. Rose, Jr. and Doctor Wayne Darrell Wells
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Obatala Blount, #9 Amended Complaint filed by Obatala Blount. Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2019 (pts)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to file objections. Plaintiff's objections to #16 Report and Recommendation due 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/5/2019. (pts)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 Supplemental OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendations by Obatala Blount. (pts)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation, by Obatala Blount. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Obatala Blount. (pts)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendations by Obatala Blount. (pts)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing service of the #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (thb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be dismissed without prejudice as a sanction re #9 Amended Complaint, and that the #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (thb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing prisoner payment; denying #12 Motion to Produce; and denying #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court directs the Clerk to serve this Order on Plaintiff and Plaintiff's custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (thb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION "Order to Show Cause for a Temporary Restraining Order" by Obatala Blount. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Obatala Blount. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Request to Produce Documents Electronically Stored Information, and Tangible Things, at a Deposition by Obatala Blount. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Obatala Blount. (pts)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT by Prisoner Obatala Blount to collection of fees. (pts)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Obatala Blount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Carr Statement of Claim, #3 Ward Statement of Claim, #4 Envelope)(pts)
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/26/2019. (pts)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order See ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis at doc #8 . PLRA due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/26/2019. (pts)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. PLRA due 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms, #2 Complaint Form) (pts)
June 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (pts)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (thb)
June 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (thb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00121. Case transferred electronically
June 24, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (bnw)
June 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Obatala Blount re #5 Order. (bnw)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : the Court TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Augusta Division, for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/24/19. (bnw)
June 12, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint, 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Obatala Blount. (dob)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUBPOENAS filed by Obatala Blount. (dob)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Obatala Blount. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount v. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obatala Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Mulloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Hammock Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Sprayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jone Cims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew N. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P. Rose, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Wayne Darrell Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?