Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Defendant: Percy Johnson and Patricia Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Patricia Johnson served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Percy Johnson served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Patricia Johnson, Percy Johnson. (thb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patricia Johnson, Percy Johnson, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resident Responsibility Agreement, #2 Exhibit Notice to Cure Default and Demand for Possession, #3 Exhibit Ledger, #4 Exhibit Summons in a Civil Action - Percy, #5 Exhibit Summons in a Civil Action - Patricia)(Hamilton, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2631094. (thb)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Patricia Johnson, Percy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(thb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Johnson, Percy Johnson, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resident Responsibility Agreement, #2 Exhibit Notice to Cure Default and Demand for Payment, #3 Exhibit Ledger, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?