Merritt v. Richmond County Sheriff Office
Plaintiff: Brodrick Kyle Merritt
Defendant: Richmond County Sheriff Office
Case Number: 1:2019cv00099
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Appeal Filing fee payment received, Amount $40.46, Receipt AUG026671. (jlh)
July 25, 2019 Filing fee payment received: Amount $25.02, Receipt AUG026518. (jlh)
July 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #8 Notice due by 8/5/2019. (jlh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of FILING DEFICIENCY re #7 Declaration. (jlh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION for Entry of Default, by Brodrick Kyle Merritt. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 Attached Signature Page) (jlh).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Brodrick Kyle Merritt. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $186.20 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Compliance due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/17/2019. (jlh) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jlh).
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brodrick Kyle Merritt. (jlh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT by Prisoner Brodrick Kyle Merritt to collection of fees. (jlh)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. PLRA due by 7/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/28/2019. (maa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brodrick Kyle Merritt. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richmond County Sheriff Office, filed by Brodrick Kyle Merritt.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt v. Richmond County Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond County Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brodrick Kyle Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?