Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. C and H Paving, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Defendant: C and H Paving, Inc. and Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00102
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. C and H Paving, Inc. answer due 9/13/2019; Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr answer due 9/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/30/2019. (pts)
August 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendants' Answer. (pts)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendants' Answer by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Dove, Taylor)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S EXTENSION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants C and H Paving, Inc. and Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr. Answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/13/2019. (pts)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. Responses due by 8/27/2019. (Dove, Taylor)
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: C and H Paving, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019; Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr answer due 8/16/2019. (pts)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on C&H Paving on 7/25/2019, filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Dove, Taylor)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Benjamin Cranford on 7/25/2019, filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Dove, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Bradley M. Harmon, as lead counsel, and Tylor L. Dove for Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. Attorney Kate Lawson Smith is terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/31/2019. (jlh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dove, Taylor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Dove on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Dove, Taylor)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to C and H Paving, Inc. and Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr. (jlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Smith, Kate)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Smith, Kate)
July 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2634959. (thb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (thb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C and H Paving, Inc., Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr, filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #5 Correct Civil Cover Sheet) (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. C and H Paving, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C and H Paving, Inc.
Represented By: Albert H. Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin C. Cranford, Jr.
Represented By: Albert H. Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Lawson Smith
Represented By: Bradley M. Harmon
Represented By: Taylor Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?