Dearing v. Roundtree et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Dearing
Defendant: Richard Roundtree, Captain White, Captain Reeves, Deputy Jailer Brown, Tyedon Burton and Deputy Jailer Alan Alspaugh, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing fee payment received, Amount $86.00, Receipt AUG026679. (jlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing fee payment received, Amount $264.00, Receipt AUG026630. (jlh)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James Edward Dearing. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $264.00 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Compliance due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/06/2019. (jlh)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/06/2019. (jlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner James Edward Dearing to collection of fees. (jlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by James Edward Dearing. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Edward Dearing. (jlh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to compliance with the conditions of this Order. PLRA due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by James Edward Dearing. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by James Edward Dearing. (Attachment: #1 Envelope.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearing v. Roundtree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jailer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyedon Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jailer Alan Alspaugh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?