United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC v. TL Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC
Defendant: TL Services, Inc. and John Doe Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00115
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon Plaintiff's #5 Notice of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/04/2019. (jlh) Modified on 9/4/2019 (jlh).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC. (Smith, Ray) Modified on 8/30/2019 (jlh).
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: TL Services, Inc. answer due 9/4/2019. (jlh)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on TL Services, Inc. on 08-14-19, filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC. (Smith, Ray)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TL Services, Inc. (jlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2654187. (jlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC v. TL Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Convergent Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Ray S. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TL Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?