Walton Plaza Properties, LLC et al v. GH Walton Way, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Walton Plaza Properties, LLC and Walton Plaza Investors, LLC
Defendant: Shaun Smith, GG Evans, LLC, Augusta Fitness, LLC, Richard Simeone, GGWW LLC, North Augusta Fitness, LLC and GH Walton Way, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00117
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Augusta Fitness, LLC, GG Evans, LLC, GGWW LLC, North Augusta Fitness, LLC, Shaun Smith. (Peil, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for the parties to conduct a conference within fourteen days of the date of this Order and to file a joint 26(f) Report within seven days of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report.) (jlh) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jlh).
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Walton Plaza Investors, LLC, Walton Plaza Properties, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Proposed Amended Complaint)(Murdison, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Augusta Fitness, LLC, North Augusta Fitness, LLC, GGWW LLC, Shaun Smith, GG Evans, LLC filed by Walton Plaza Investors, LLC, Walton Plaza Properties, LLC. (Murdison, Andrew)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). The new deadline for Plaintiffs to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended through and including September 6, 2019. Responses due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 08/21/2019. (jlh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to 9/6/2019 by Walton Plaza Investors, LLC. Responses due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murdison, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Alexander Murdison on behalf of all Plaintiffs. (Murdison, Andrew) Modified on 8/16/2019 (jlh).
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Augusta Fitness, LLC, GG Evans, LLC, GGWW LLC, North Augusta Fitness, LLC, Shaun Smith re #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #2 Rule 26(f) Order (Peil, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ******* MOTION to Dismiss by Augusta Fitness, LLC, GG Evans, LLC, GGWW LLC, North Augusta Fitness, LLC, Shaun Smith. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Peil, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #3 Notice due by 8/15/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. (jlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (jlh)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by GGWW LLC, GH Walton Way, LLC, Augusta Fitness, LLC, Walton Plaza Investors, LLC, GG Evans, LLC, North Augusta Fitness, LLC, Walton Plaza Properties, LLC, Shaun Smith from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2019RCCV00371. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2655769.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Standing Order for Mediation in Civil Cases; #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service; #3 Exhibit C - Annual Registration of Walton Plaza Properties, LLC; #4 Exhibit D - Annual Registration of Walton Plaza Investors, LLC, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Shaun Smith; #6 Exhibit F - Application for Distress Warrant & Writ of Possession; #7 Exhibit G - Summons re Affidavit of Writ; #8 Exhibit H - Interloctory Consent Order; and #9 Notice of Removal to Federal Court.)(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2019: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton Plaza Properties, LLC et al v. GH Walton Way, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GG Evans, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGWW LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Augusta Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH Walton Way, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Peil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walton Plaza Properties, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Alexander Murdison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walton Plaza Investors, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Alexander Murdison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?