Cobb v. United States of America
Petitioner: Darius Vontrell Cobb
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00135
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave of Absence for Attorney Patricia G. Rhodes for the following dates: October 29, 2019 through October 31, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/30/2019. (jlh)
September 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to United States of America for dates of : October 29, 2019 through October 31, 2019. (thb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to United States of America for dates of : October 29, 2019 through October 31, 2019 by United States of America. Responses due by 10/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Patricia)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #3 Order due by 10/27/2019. (jlh)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court directs Respondent to file an answer or response within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/28/2019. (jlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Darius Vontrell Cobb. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Darius Vontrell Cobb.(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darius Vontrell Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia Green Rhodes
Represented By: Nancy Colleen Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?