Brown v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nicola Fannile Brown
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Not Yet Classified: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/27/2019. (cjc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for W. Daniel Mayes, Fee Amount $200.00, Receipt #AUG026837 by Nicola Fannile Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Andrew Saul (Statkus, Shannon)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (thb)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/6/2019. (pts)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicola Fannile Brown. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Nicola Fannile Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Fannile Brown
Represented By: Kipler Scott Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?