Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A. v. Waterfront Marine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.
Defendant: John Gridley and Waterfront Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.. (Stine, Kevin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Litigants' Bill of Rights by John Gridley, Waterfront Marine, Inc.. (Wills, Charles)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by John Gridley, Waterfront Marine, Inc.. (Wills, Charles)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by John Gridley, Waterfront Marine, Inc..(Wills, Charles)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John Gridley answer due 10/16/2019; Waterfront Marine, Inc. answer due 10/16/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/3/2019. (maa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John Gridley, Waterfront Marine, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Wills, Charles)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Wills on behalf of All Defendants (Wills, Charles)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.. John Gridley served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Stine, Kevin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.. Waterfront Marine, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Stine, Kevin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.. (Stine, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/13/2019. (maa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Gridley, Waterfront Marine, Inc. (maa)
September 13, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2682233. (maa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Gridley, Waterfront Marine, Inc., filed by Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A. v. Waterfront Marine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gridley
Represented By: Charles W. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamaha Motor Finance Corporation, U.S.A.
Represented By: Kevin A. Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?