United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc. v. B.L. Harbert International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc.
Defendant: Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America and B.L. Harbert International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00173
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay and for Order Compelling Arbitration by B.L. Harbert International, LLC. Responses due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit William Lalor)(Peters, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by B.L. Harbert International, LLC (Peters, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. B.L. Harbert International, LLC answer due 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/5/2019. (maa)
November 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (maa)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by B.L. Harbert International, LLC. Responses due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Filiberto, Crystal)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/15/2019. (cjc)
October 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William F. Clayon Receipt Number 113J-2702471, Fee Amount $200, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaitlin F. Tweel Receipt Number 113J-2702472, Fee Amount $200. (pts)
October 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert P. Noell, Receipt Number 113J-2702469, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaitlin F. Tweel Receipt Number 113J-2702472, Fee Amount $200, by United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc.. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Admission)(McCoy, Mathew) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jlh).
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William F. Clayon Receipt Number 113J-2702471, Fee Amount $200, by United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc.. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission)(McCoy, Mathew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert P. Noell Receipt Number 113J-2702469, Fee Amount $200, by United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc.. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(McCoy, Mathew)
September 27, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2692928. (maa)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Forms) (maa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to B.L. Harbert International, LLC, Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, Zurich American Insurance Company. (maa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by United States of America, for the use and benefit of, Superior Steel, Inc. (maa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, for the use and benefit of, Superior Steel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc. v. B.L. Harbert International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.L. Harbert International, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Superior Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew M. McCoy
Represented By: Robert P. Noell
Represented By: Kaitlin F. Tweel
Represented By: William F. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?