JH-Bey TM et al v. Momodu et al
Plaintiff: Annette L. Hollins and LaWanda JH-Bey TM
Defendant: Deputy Marshal for Richmond County, A. Michelle Momodu, Midfirst Bank, Civil Court of Richmond County, Jonathan Kasper, Augusta Richmond County and McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00176
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing service of the #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/04/2019. (jlh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case, re #1 Complaint, be dismissed without prejudice and this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/04/2019. (jlh)
November 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 11/26/2019. (thb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Plaintiff to amend her complaint to include all of her allegations in one document within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/12/2019. (thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #1 Complaint Form) (thb).
October 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (pts)
October 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Proceed IFP due by 11/12/2019. (thb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement by LaWanda JH-Bey TM re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (thb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Annette L. Hollins. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/1/2019. (thb)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings, #2 Receipt of Instructions) (thb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Financial Statement by LaWanda JH-Bey TM. (thb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Augusta Richmond County, Deputy Marshal for Richmond County, Civil Court of Richmond County, Jonathan Kasper, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC, Midfirst Bank, A. Michelle Momodu, filed by LaWanda JH-Bey TM.(thb) Modified on 10/11/2019 (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JH-Bey TM et al v. Momodu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Marshal for Richmond County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Michelle Momodu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midfirst Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Court of Richmond County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Richmond County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette L. Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaWanda JH-Bey TM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?