Nakaddu, LLC v. Red Oak Capital Fund II, LLC
Appellant: Nakaddu, LLC
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Appellee: Red Oak Capital Fund II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00203
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leon S. Jones on behalf of Secured Investment Lending Corporation (Jones, Leon)
January 8, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, MOTION TO CORRECT APPELLEE OF RECORD MOTION to Dismiss. (maa)
January 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, MOTION TO CORRECT APPELLEE OF RECORD MOTION to Dismiss (maa)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 ******* MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, MOTION TO CORRECT APPELLEE OF RECORD, MOTION to Dismiss by Red Oak Capital Fund II, LLC. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagler, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE and Clerk's Certification of Service to Counsel and Parties of Record re this Bankruptcy Appeal. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 2/5/2020.)(jlh) Modified on 1/6/2020 (jlh).
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record Appellant Brief due by 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 19-10977 Record on Appeal) (USBC-Toole, Christina)
January 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 2/5/2020. (jlh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-10977. File received, filed by Nakaddu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet for Bankruptcy Case 19-10977, #2 dckt #79 - Notice to Retain Counsel, #3 dckt #110 - Notice of Appeal, #4 dckt #109 - Order Appointing Trustee, #5 dckt # 112 - Notice of Defective Appeal, #6 dckt #115 - Notice to Appellant)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nakaddu, LLC v. Red Oak Capital Fund II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nakaddu, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Red Oak Capital Fund II, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Hagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?