Champlin v. Bill Beazley Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Champlin
Defendant: Bill Beazley Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00016
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Eric Champlin. (Rothman, Joel)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Bill Beazley Homes, Inc. answer due 4/9/2020. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/12/2020. (thb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement and MOTION for Extension of Time Answer by Eric Champlin (Rothman, Joel) Modified on 3/11/2020 (thb).
February 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bill Beazley Homes, Inc. answer/response due 3/11/2020. (thb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S EXTENSION ORDER granting #5 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Defendant Bill Beazley Homes, Inc. shall have until March 11, 2020 to respond to the Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 02/20/2020. (thb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to March 11, 2020 by Bill Beazley Homes, Inc.. Responses due by 3/5/2020. (Stewart, David)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Champlin. Bill Beazley Homes, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Rothman, Joel)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bill Beazley Homes, Inc. (jlh)
January 31, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2774200. (jlh)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Beazley Homes, Inc., filed by Eric Champlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Report on Action, and #5 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champlin v. Bill Beazley Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Champlin
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Beazley Homes, Inc.
Represented By: David Mitchell Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?