Beard v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jewel A. Beard
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00019
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Social Security Administration, #2 Summons - Civil Process Clerk.) (jlh) Modified on 2/11/2020 (jlh).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Documents, and accepts as docketed Plaintiff's signature pages for her Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet; and granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct IFP motion; therefore, Plaintiff is permitted to proceed IFP subject to objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/10/2020. (jlh)
February 7, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct. (jlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Amend Correct #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP, filed by Jewel A. Beard.(Wilkinson, Charles) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jlh).
February 6, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #5 First MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint, etc. (jlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint, etc. by Jewel A. Beard. Responses due by 2/20/2020. (Wilkinson, Charles)
February 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #4 Notice due by 2/20/2020. (jlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jlh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jewel A. Beard. Responses due by 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Social Security Disability, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilkinson, Charles)
February 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #2 Notice due by 2/26/2020. (jlh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion Form.)(jlh)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Jewel A. Beard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020: #2 Signature Page of Complaint, #3 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (jlh). Modified on 2/5/2020 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel A. Beard
Represented By: Charles L. Wilkinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?