ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC v. Gruner Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC
Defendant: Gruner Enterprises, LLC, Robert Gruner, III and Gruner Enterprises, LLC doing business as Carisma Financial Corp. doing business as #1 Big Daddy Car Co. doing business as Simple Auto Finance
Case Number: 1:2020cv00085
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/13/2020. (cjc)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings. Such response shall be extended through the twentieth day following the ruling in the USDC, for the Northern District of Texas (CV 320-1440). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/13/2020. (jlh)
August 12, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tyler M. Simpson, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Winikka. (jlh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tyler M. Simpson by Robert Gruner, III, Gruner Enterprises, LLC. Fee Paid BGASDC-2901593 $200.00. Responses due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brewton, Benjamin) Modified on 8/12/2020 (pts).
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Winikka by Robert Gruner, III, Gruner Enterprises, LLC. Fee Paid AGASDC-2901593 $200.00. Responses due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brewton, Benjamin) Modified on 8/12/2020 (pts).
August 12, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jlh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2901551, Fee Amount $200, by Robert Gruner, III, Gruner Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter and Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brewton, Benjamin)
August 12, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Including Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss. (jlh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Including Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss , by Robert Gruner, III, Gruner Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brewton, Benjamin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H. Brewton on behalf of All Defendants (Brewton, Benjamin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC. Robert Gruner, III waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Levis, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC. Gruner Enterprises, LLC waiver sent on 6/19/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Levis, Jon)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC. (Levis, Jon)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 . (Levis, Jon)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC. (Levis, Jon)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/19/2020. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2020: #1 Blank Forms) (jlh).
June 19, 2020 Filing fee: $400, receipt number AGASDC-2865032. (maa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Gruner, III, Gruner Enterprises, LLC, filed by ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC v. Gruner Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Loan Co. of Martinez, LLC
Represented By: Jon Alexander Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruner Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gruner, III
Represented By: Craig F. Simon
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Daniel P. Winikka
Represented By: Tyler M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruner Enterprises, LLC doing business as Carisma Financial Corp. doing business as #1 Big Daddy Car Co. doing business as Simple Auto Finance
Represented By: Craig F. Simon
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Daniel P. Winikka
Represented By: Tyler M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?