Williams v. Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Lesley Williams
Defendant: Dr. Phillip Coule, John Does, Dr. Brooks Keel, Dr. Walter Moore, Dr. Steffen Meiler, Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia doing business as Augusta University doing business as AU Health System doing business as Medical College of Georgia doing business as Augusta University Hospital, Dr. Mary Arthur, AU Medical Center, Inc., AU Health System, Inc. and Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Case Number: 1:2020cv00100
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Phillip Coule. (Threlkeld, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief in Support by Phillip Coule re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Threlkeld, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Mary Arthur, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Brooks Keel, Steffen Meiler, Walter Moore. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Cathey, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by AU Health System, Inc., AU Medical Center, Inc. (Threlkeld, Robert) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jlh).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020, Discovery due by 12/8/2020, Motions due by 1/7/2021, Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 10/5/2020, Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 11/4/2020, Status Report due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/24/2020. (pts) Modified on 8/24/2020 (pts).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/24/2020. (pts)
August 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/7/2021. (pts)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Threlkeld, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Amend Caption by AU Health System, Inc., AU Medical Center, Inc.. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Threlkeld, Robert)
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Joint MOTION to Amend Caption, #14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (pts)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed August 19, 2020 Acknowledgement filed by Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia. (Cathey, Thomas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lesley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AUMC Articles of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit Coule Letter of Suspension/Termination, #3 Exhibit Meiler Arthur Letter to Coule, #4 Exhibit MTD Brief 418cv192, #5 Exhibit MTD Order 418cv192)(Jeffords, Tanya)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/03/2020. (thb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Lesley Williams. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeffords, Tanya)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Mary Arthur, Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia, Brooks Keel, Steffen Meiler, Walter Moore. (Cathey, Thomas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Mary Arthur, Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia, Brooks Keel, Steffen Meiler, Walter Moore.(Cathey, Thomas)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 ******* MOTION to Dismiss by Phillip Coule. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Coule, MD Brief ISO MTD)(Threlkeld, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AU Health System, Inc., AU Medical Center, Inc. identifying AU Health System, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Threlkeld, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by AU Health System, Inc., AU Medical Center, Inc..(Threlkeld, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Mary Arthur answer due 7/22/2020; Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia answer due 7/22/2020; Phillip Coule answer due 7/22/2020; John Does answer due 7/22/2020; Brooks Keel answer due 7/22/2020; Steffen Meiler answer due 7/22/2020; Walter Moore answer due 7/22/2020. Compliance due by 7/25/2020. (thb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steffen Meiler, Walter Moore, Mary Arthur, Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia, Phillip Coule, Brooks Keel from Superior Court of Richmond County, GA, case number 2020RCCV00265. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGASDC-2881758) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Order, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Joint Notice of Removal)(thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Lesley Williams
Represented By: Tanya Jeffords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Phillip Coule
Represented By: Robert C. Threlkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Brooks Keel
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Katherine Powers Stoff
Represented By: Bryan K. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Walter Moore
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Katherine Powers Stoff
Represented By: Bryan K. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Steffen Meiler
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Katherine Powers Stoff
Represented By: Bryan K. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University Systems of Georgia doing business as Augusta University doing business as AU Health System doing business as Medical College of Georgia doing business as Augusta University Hospital
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Katherine Powers Stoff
Represented By: Bryan K. Webb
Represented By: Robert C. Threlkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mary Arthur
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Katherine Powers Stoff
Represented By: Bryan K. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Threlkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Threlkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Katherine Powers Stoff
Represented By: Bryan K. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?