BURNETT v. STATE BOARD OF PARDONS AND PAROLES et al
Petitioner: Anthony Burnett
Respondent: DR R L HANZLICK, State Board of Pardons and Paroles, Logan Marshall, Dennis C. Sanders, THEODORE C JACKSON, Lucy Jackson Bell and Georgia Department of Corrections
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00117
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Petitioner shall have through and including October 21, 2020 to file his objections to the Court's 22 R&R. Responses due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/07/2020. (jlh)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections as to #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 20-13605-G for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Burnett. (ca)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner is reminded he has through and including October 9, 2020, to file objections to the Court's #13 R&R. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/25/2020. (jlh) Modified on 9/25/2020 (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #3 Motion to Stay, #15 Notice of Appeal, and #8 Order on Motion to Stay. Other Appeals: No; Judge Appealed: Marc T. Treadwell; Court Reporter: N/A; Fee Paid: No; Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet.) (jlh)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Anthony Burnett. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (jlh).
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion to Stay, by Anthony Burnett. Filing fee $505.00. (jlh)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing service of the #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/22/2020. (jlh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Petitioner's #2 and #6 Motions to proceed IFP be denied as moot, Petitioner's #12 Motion for Dismissal of his state conviction be denied as moot, and Petitioner's #1 Petition be dismissed, and this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/22/2020. (jlh) Modified on 9/22/2020 (jlh). Modified on 9/23/2020 (jlh).
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Dismissal, by Anthony Burnett. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jlh).
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 A Grant of General Power of Attorney, by Anthony Burnett. (jlh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Transfer. (pts)
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 , #2 . (pts)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00220. Case transferred electronically
August 21, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Georgia Southern. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/4/2020.) (vs)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Stay; ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/21/2020. (kat)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing written objections to prosecution by ANTHONY BURNETT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(vs)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by ANTHONY BURNETT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing consent by ANTHONY BURNETT (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Case in the Middle District, Macon Division Filed by ANTHONY BURNETT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) Modified to correct date filed on 6/9/2020 (tam).
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by ANTHONY BURNETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) Modified to correct date filed on 6/9/2020 (tam).
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS,filed by ANTHONY BURNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(tam) Modified to correct file date on 6/9/2020 (tam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNETT v. STATE BOARD OF PARDONS AND PAROLES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DR R L HANZLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Logan Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis C. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THEODORE C JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lucy Jackson Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?