The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz and Brian W. Tucker
Defendant: Tim McFalls, Terence Dicks, Anh Lee, Bradford J. Raffensperger, Sherry T. Barnes, Rebecca N. Sullivan, Marcia Brown, Bob Finnegan, David J. Worley, Matthew Mashburn and Anh Le
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, DSCC, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc. (GCPA), Helen Butler and Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00180
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 52 USCA Case Number 21-10183-CC for #50 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward T. Metz, Cathy A. Latham, Brian W. Tucker, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee. (pts)
January 21, 2021 F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re #50 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pts)
January 19, 2021 Filing 51 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for TRO #50 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No; Judge Appealed: Hall; Court Reporter: Davenport; Fee Paid: Yes; Pending COA/IFP: N/A. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Documents)(pts)
January 15, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for TRO, #48 Clerk's Judgment by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGASDC-3012366. (Kachouroff, Christopher)
January 1, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/17/2020, before Judge JRH. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Davenport, Telephone number 706-823-6468. Tape Number: FTR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 1/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2021. (Davenport, Lisa)
December 17, 2020 Filing 48 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2020. (pts)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Dismiss and #28 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #2 Motion for TRO. This case is dismissed with prejudice and stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/17/2020. (pts)
December 17, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held by video teleconference before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Edward T. Metz, Cathy A. Latham, Brian W. Tucker, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David J. Worley, Rebecca N. Sullivan, Bradford J. Raffensperger, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, #10 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. Court to enter an Order. (Court Reporter Lisa Davenport.) (cjc)
December 16, 2020 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Rebuttal Declaration of Alex Chilton filed by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. (Kachouroff, Christopher)
December 16, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #31 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam VOID MOTION to Intervene Reply to All Defendants' Opposition filed by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. (Kachouroff, Christopher)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2020. (cjc)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2020. (cjc)
December 16, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tim McFalls. Responses due by 12/30/2020. (LaRoss, Diane)
December 16, 2020 Filing 40 Brief in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc. (GCPA), Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (pts)
December 16, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc. (GCPA), Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(pts)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is directed to add the herein named Intervenor-Defendants as parties to this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/16/2020. (pts)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2020. (cjc)
December 16, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bryan P. Tyson Receipt Number AGASDC-2987551, Fee Amount $200, by Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls. Responses due by 12/30/2020. (LaRoss, Diane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #1 Corrected Application) (pts).
December 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Festin LaRoss on behalf of Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls (LaRoss, Diane)
December 16, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam VOID MOTION to Intervene filed by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. (Kachouroff, Christopher)
December 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julie Marie Houk. (pts)
December 16, 2020 PRO HAC VICE PAID for Attorney Bryan Jacoutot re Tim McFalls; Amount $200.00, Receipt # AUG028644, Date: 12/16/2020. (jlh)
December 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (pts)
December 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura Hill. (pts)
December 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bryan P. Tyson (pts)
December 15, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julie Marie Houk Receipt Number AGASDC-2987424, Fee Amount $200, by Helen Butler. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Other cases in District, #2 Exhibit Ex. B cert god stand ND Ca Houk, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order admitting JHouk PHV)(Batson, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura Hill Receipt Number AGASDC-2987420, Fee Amount $200, by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - L. Hill Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Joyce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #2 Flattened PDF) (pts). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #3 Statement of Cases) (pts).
December 15, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam VOID, MOTION to Intervene by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP,, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc. (GCPA), Helen Butler. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Woodall Dec, #2 Affidavit Butler Dec, #3 Affidavit Powers Dec., #4 Exhibit Prop Answ of Intervenors, #5 Briefs Prop Brief Opp TRO by Ivrs, #6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Intervention, #7 Text of Proposed Order Denying TRO)(Batson, John)
December 15, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Pearson v. Kemp Hr'g Tr., #2 Ex. 2 - Boland v. Raffensperger Order)(Lewis, Joyce)
December 15, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. of Lynn Bailey)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 28 ******* MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief in Support of Motion)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Bradford J. Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Willard, Russell)
December 15, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Bradford J. Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Response in Opposition)(Willard, Russell)
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Cathy Latham (Kachouroff, Christopher)
December 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell David Willard on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Bradford J. Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Willard, Russell)
December 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker Certificate of Substantial Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Kachouroff, Christopher)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/15/2020. (cjc)
December 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc E. Elias #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda R. Callais #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Geise (pts)
December 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John M. Geise Receipt Number AGASDC-2986339, Fee Amount $200, by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Lewis, Joyce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2020: #1 Flattened PDF) (pts).
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda R. Callais Receipt Number AGASDC-2986338, Fee Amount $200, by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Lewis, Joyce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2020: #1 Flattened PDF) (pts).
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc E. Elias Receipt Number AGASDC-2986337, Fee Amount $200, by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Lewis, Joyce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2020: #1 Flattened PDF) (pts).
December 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion by Electronic Means #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM in AUG-DistVTC before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. *VTC information provided to parties via email. The dedicated public access lines are: Phone # 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 7091723; Security Code: 1234 OR Phone # 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8878734; Security Code: 1234.(lcw)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM in AUG-DistVTC before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. THE COURT ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall perfect service on Defendants by 9:00 P.M. EST Today, December 14, 2020. Should any party require a subpoena from the Court, counsel shall notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk in advance and in no event later than 4PM on 12/15/2020. Exhibits shall be provided to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk no later than 12:00PM EST on 12/16/2020. Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants shall file their briefs in opposition to #2 by 12/15/2020 at 9:00PM EST. Plaintiff's reply briefs or any responses to a motion to dismiss or any other motion filed by Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants will be due on Wednesday, 12/16/2020, by 3:00PM EST. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/14/2020. (pts)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam M. Sparks Receipt Number BGASDC-2985220, Fee Amount $200, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing_Adam M. Sparks)(Lewis, Joyce)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.(pts)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene. The Court Orders Intervenor-Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs' #2 Emergency Motion by 7:00 P.M., Tuesday, December 15, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/14/2020. (pts)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam M. Sparks. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/16/2020. (pts)
December 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 12/15/2020. (pts)
December 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam M. Sparks. (pts)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam M. Sparks Receipt Number BGASDC-2985220, Fee Amount $200, by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. Responses due by 12/25/2020. (Lewis, Joyce)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Lewis, Joyce)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DSCC. Responses due by 12/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Proposed Intervenor-Defendants' Proposed Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Lewis, Joyce)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/11/2020. (cjc)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 Third MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2984187, Fee Amount $200, by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. Responses due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Filing In Support of Pro Hac Vice)(Vines, Johnny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2020: #3 Signed Cert of Good Standing) (pts).
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2984179, Fee Amount $200, by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. Responses due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing In Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Vines, Johnny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2020: #3 Signed Cert of Good Standing) (pts).
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2984159, Fee Amount $200, by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. Responses due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing In Support of Pro Hac Vice Applications, #2 Proposed Order)(Vines, Johnny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2020: #3 Signed Cert of Good Standing) (pts).
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker, Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. (Vines, Johnny)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Anh Lee, Tim McFalls, Bradford J. Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, and David J. Worley. (jlh)
December 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 - #8 PHV Motions. (pts)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Cathy A. Latham, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Brian W. Tucker. Responses due by 12/23/2020. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Brian W. Tucker, Edward T. Metz, The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee, Cathy A. Latham. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-2983503, $402.00.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McFalls
Represented By: Bryan F. Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Dicks
Represented By: Bryan F. Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford J. Raffensperger
Represented By: Russell David Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry T. Barnes
Represented By: Bryan F. Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Russell David Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Brown
Represented By: Bryan F. Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Finnegan
Represented By: Bryan F. Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: Russell David Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Russell David Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Russell David Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Twelfth Congressional District Republican Committee
Represented By: Johnny Emmett Clyde Vines
Represented By: Patrick M. McSweeney
Represented By: Robert J. Cynkar
Represented By: Christopher I. Kachouroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy A. Latham
Represented By: Johnny Emmett Clyde Vines
Represented By: Patrick M. McSweeney
Represented By: Robert J. Cynkar
Represented By: Christopher I. Kachouroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T. Metz
Represented By: Johnny Emmett Clyde Vines
Represented By: Patrick M. McSweeney
Represented By: Robert J. Cynkar
Represented By: Christopher I. Kachouroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian W. Tucker
Represented By: Johnny Emmett Clyde Vines
Represented By: Patrick M. McSweeney
Represented By: Robert J. Cynkar
Represented By: Christopher I. Kachouroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: John Paul Batson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSCC
Represented By: Adam M. Sparks
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: John M. Geise
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Laura Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc. (GCPA)
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: John Paul Batson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Helen Butler
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: John Paul Batson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Adam M. Sparks
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: John M. Geise
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Laura Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?