Green v. Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Green
Defendant: Jack Clapp, Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc., Amguard Insurance Company and Clapp's Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00048
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Jack Clapp. (thb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Submitted (Crane, Henry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 22 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Clapp's Transport, Inc.. (Hammock, Austin)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021; Discovery due by 8/23/2021; Motions due by 1/3/2022; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 9/22/2021; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 10/22/2021; and Status Report due by 11/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/13/2021. (jlh)
April 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials re #15 Certificate of Counsel. (JH)
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials as to Clapp's Transport, Inc. re 18 Certificate of Service, 17 Certificate of Counsel. (cmr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Clapp's Transport, Inc.. (Hammock, Austin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** Modified on 4/12/2021 (JH).
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Luskin, Robert)
April 8, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc as a party to this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/22/21. (wwp)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Amguard Insurance Company re #10 Consent MOTION to Dismiss and Drop Defendant Clapp Environmental Services, Inc. (Noble, III, Robert)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Shannon Green. (Crane, Henry)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Dismiss and Drop Defendant Clapp Environmental Services, Inc. by Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/26/2021. (Campbell, John)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Shannon Green. (Crane, Henry)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Amguard Insurance Company. (Noble, III, Robert)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Luskin on behalf of Amguard Insurance Company (Luskin, Robert)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Clapp's Transport, Inc..(Hammock, Austin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Nelson Crane, III on behalf of Shannon Green (Crane, Henry)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Amguard Insurance Company.(Noble, III, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/14/2021. (jlh)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/04/2021. (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2021RCSC00186, filed by Amguard Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGASDC-3053484.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Cover sheet, Summons, Affidavit re Service of Process, Certificate of Acknowledgment, Notice of Service, Amended Standing Order, #3 Exhibit C - Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court of Removal, and #5 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
March 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amguard Insurance Company answer due 3/11/2021. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Clapp
Represented By: Austin Mark Hammock
Represented By: John David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clapp's Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Noble, III
Represented By: Robert A. Luskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clapp's Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Austin Mark Hammock
Represented By: John David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Green
Represented By: Henry Nelson Crane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?