Chalker et al v. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Chalker and Sheryll Chalker
Defendant: Defendants A, B, C, and D, Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00054
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC identifying Dollar Tree, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Hankins, James)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2021. Discovery due by 10/20/2021. Motions due by 11/19/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/19/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/20/2021. Status Report due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/30/21. (wwp)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hankins, James)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacque D. Hawk on behalf of Bobby Chalker, Sheryll Chalker (Hawk, Jacque)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to comply with the Clerk's #3 Removal Notice. (Compliance due by 4/20/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/13/2021. (jlh)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/3/2021. Pending Motions due by 4/7/2021. (ca)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/24/2021. (ca)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of McDuffie County, Georgia, case number 21CV0075. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3068705), filed by Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Superior Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC, and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chalker et al v. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A, B, C, and D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: James T. Hankins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Hankins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Chalker
Represented By: Jacque D. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryll Chalker
Represented By: Jacque D. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?