Golf Travel, LLC v. Mullins et al
Plaintiff: Golf Travel, LLC
Defendant: John Doe 1-10, ABC Corp 1-20, Joseph Mullins and Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00063
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Joseph Mullins and Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC's. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on June 7, 2021. (jrb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Golf Travel, LLC. (Sparks, John)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Golf Travel, LLC.(Sparks, John)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph Frails on behalf of Joseph Mullins, Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC (Frails, Randolph)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Mullins, Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC.(Haynes, Tameka)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Mullins, Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC. Responses due by 6/4/2021. (Haynes, Tameka)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #4 Affidavit of Service, #5 Notice of Filing. No action required. (slt)
May 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joseph Mullins answer due 5/21/2021. Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC answer due 5/21/2021. (slt)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Golf Travel, LLC Affidavit of Service Joseph Mullins (Sparks, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Mullins Sports and Entertainment LLC on April 30, 2021, filed by Golf Travel, LLC. (Sparks, John)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/9/21. (wwp)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Mullins, Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(wwp)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Golf Travel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)
April 9, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC - 3080770. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golf Travel, LLC v. Mullins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golf Travel, LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mullins
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullins Sports and Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?