Miller v. Total Life Changes, LLC
Plaintiff: Ashley Miller
Defendant: Total Life Changes, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00095
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the parties' consent #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Total Life Changes, LLC answer due 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/12/2021. (ca)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (thb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Total Life Changes, LLC. Responses due by 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cashbaugh, Travis)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/28/2021. (cjc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3134135, Fee Amount $200, by Ashley Miller. Responses due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of All Cases, #3 Exhibit Order of Admission)(Beasley, John)
June 25, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3134135, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Ashley Miller. (Raimey, Chloe)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Miller. Total Life Changes, LLC waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Raimey, Chloe)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/15/2021. (cjc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3127596, Fee Amount $200, by Ashley Miller. Responses due by 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of All Cases, #3 Exhibit Order of Admission)(Beasley, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3127593, Fee Amount $200, by Ashley Miller. Responses due by 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of All Cases, #3 Exhibit Order of Admission)(Beasley, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3127580, Fee Amount $200, by Ashley Miller. Responses due by 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of All Cases, #3 Exhibit Order of Admission)(Beasley, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ashley Miller. (Beasley, John)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Filing Forms.) (jlh)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Total Life Changes, LLC. (jlh)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Total Life Changes, LLC, filed by Ashley Miller. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3127259, $402.00.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
June 15, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Total Life Changes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Life Changes, LLC
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Miller
Represented By: Anna P. Prakash
Represented By: Matthew H. Morgan
Represented By: John F. Beasley, Jr.
Represented By: Chloe A. Raimey
Represented By: David Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?