Abdulla v. Southern Bank et al
Plaintiff: Sohail M. Abdulla
Defendant: Sardis Bankshares, Inc. and Southern Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv00099
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/20/2021. (ca)
August 19, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #17 MOTION for Leave to File. (kjm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by Sohail M. Abdulla. Responses due by 9/1/2021. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
August 13, 2021 Filing 16 Exhibit re #13 Affidavit by Southern Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilhelmi, Mark) Modified on 8/16/2021 (JH).
August 13, 2021 Filing 15 Exhibit re #13 Affidavit by Southern Bank. (Wilhelmi, Mark) Modified on 8/16/2021 (JH).
August 13, 2021 Filing 14 Exhibit re #13 Affidavit by Southern Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilhelmi, Mark) Modified on 8/16/2021 (JH).
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #12 Response by Southern Bank. (Wilhelmi, Mark)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Notice of Intent filed by Southern Bank, #10 Response to Motion, filed by Sohail M. Abdulla filed by Southern Bank. (Wilhelmi, Mark)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Intent TO FILE REPLY BRIEF by Southern Bank re #10 Response to Motion,. (Stebbins, Charles)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed by Sohail M. Abdulla. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sohail M. Abdulla, #2 Affidavit of Larry Merideth, #3 Exhibit R1-R3A, #4 Exhibit R4-R7, #5 Exhibit R8-R8A, and #6 Exhibit R9-R11.) (jlh)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Southern Bank. (Stebbins, Charles)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 . (Stebbins, Charles)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Southern Bank. (Stebbins, Charles)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 ******* MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, Insufficiency of Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim by Southern Bank. Responses due by 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Affidavit)(Stebbins, Charles). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/15/2021 (slt).
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sohail M. Abdulla. Sardis Bankshares, Inc. served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021; Southern Bank served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (ca)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER providing Plaintiff with basic instructions regarding the development and progression of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/24/2021. (maa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sardis Bankshares, Inc. and Southern Bank. (jlh)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/23/2021. (Attachment: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sardis Bankshares, Inc. and Southern Bank, filed by Sohail M. Abdulla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7-10, #4 Exhibit 11-13, #5 Exhibit 14-24, and #6 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
June 23, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number AUG029527. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulla v. Southern Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sohail M. Abdulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sardis Bankshares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Bank
Represented By: Charles C. Stebbins, III
Represented By: Mark L. Wilhelmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?