Cox et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard Cox and Kathleen Cox
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00126
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Kathleen Cox, Richard Cox. (Weinstein, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (McMullen, Melissa)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2021. Discovery due by 3/8/2022. Motions due by 4/7/2022. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/7/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/6/2022. Status Report due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/22/2021. (csr)
September 21, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (slt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Weinstein, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officerfor possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/27/2021. (thb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Weinstein, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2021 (thb).
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brett Weinstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weinstein, Michael)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Mr. Weinstein to file a notice of appearance or otherwise file a notice for the record who will be representing Plaintiffs in this case within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/8/2021. (maa)
September 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/15/2021. (maa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of #1 Removal to All Counsel of Record. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/30/2021.) (jlh)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Forms.) (jlh)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2021-RCSC-00732, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number BGASDC-3169217.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons, Complaint, Notice of Filing Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Answer to Complaint, Jury Demand, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cox
Represented By: Michael Brett Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Cox
Represented By: Michael Brett Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Cordell McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?