Colon v. Roundtree et al
Plaintiff: Valencia Colon
Defendant: Richard Roundtree, Hardie Davis, William Fennoy, Dennis Williams, Mary Davis, Sammie Sias, Bobby Williams, Ben Hassan, Sean Frantom, Brandon Garrett, Marion Williams, John Clarke, Odie Donald, II, Maurice McDowell, Charlie T. Walker, John Does 1-5 and ABC Corp 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv00149
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a conference within fourteen days of the date of this Order and to file a joint 26(f) Report within seven days of the conference. The Court Directs the Clerk to attach the standard "Rule 26(f) Report" to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report. (csr)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by John Clarke, Hardie Davis, Mary Davis, Odie Donald, II, William Fennoy, Sean Frantom, Brandon Garrett, Ben Hassan, Maurice McDowell, Richard Roundtree, Sammie Sias, Charlie T. Walker, Bobby Williams, Dennis Williams, Marion Williams.(Haynes, Tameka)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/1/2021. (cjc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3198384, Fee Amount $200,, #6 Notice of Filing, Set/Reset Deadlines by Valencia Colon. Responses due by 10/15/2021. (Wills, Charles)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After 2 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/3/2021. (thb)
October 1, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3198384, Fee Amount $200, #6 Notice of Filing, Set/Reset Deadlines, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Receipt Number AGASDC-3198384, Fee Amount $200. (thb) Modified on 10/1/2021 (thb).
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3198384, Fee Amount $200, by Valencia Colon. Responses due by 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wills, Charles)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Wills on behalf of Valencia Colon (Wills, Charles)
September 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: John Clarke answer due 10/11/2021; Hardie Davis answer due 10/11/2021; Mary Davis answer due 10/11/2021; Odie Donald, II answer due 10/11/2021; William Fennoy answer due 10/11/2021; Sean Frantom answer due 10/11/2021; Brandon Garrett answer due 10/11/2021; Ben Hassan answer due 10/11/2021; Maurice McDowell answer due 10/11/2021; Richard Roundtree answer due 10/11/2021; Sammie Sias answer due 10/11/2021; Charlie T. Walker answer due 10/11/2021; Bobby Williams answer due 10/11/2021; Dennis Williams answer due 10/11/2021; Marion Williams answer due 10/11/2021. (thb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: John Clarke answer due 9/27/2021; Hardie Davis answer due 9/27/2021; Mary Davis answer due 9/27/2021; Odie Donald, II answer due 9/27/2021; William Fennoy answer due 9/27/2021; Sean Frantom answer due 9/27/2021; Brandon Garrett answer due 9/27/2021; Ben Hassan answer due 9/27/2021; Maurice McDowell answer due 9/27/2021; Richard Roundtree answer due 9/27/2021; Sammie Sias answer due 9/27/2021; Charlie T. Walker answer due 9/27/2021; Bobby Williams answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Williams answer due 9/27/2021; Marion Williams answer due 9/27/2021. Compliance due by 9/30/2021. Pending Motions due by 10/4/2021. (ca)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/20/2021. (ca)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Richmond County, case number 2021RCCV00481. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3189852), filed by Brandon Garrett, Sammie Sias, Richard Roundtree, Charlie T. Walker, John Clarke, Mary Davis, Hardie Davis, Ben Hassan, Marion Williams, Odie Donald, II, Maurice McDowell, Bobby Williams, William Fennoy, Sean Frantom, Dennis Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Wavier of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Roundtree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia Colon
Represented By: J. Wickliffe Cauthorn
Represented By: Charles W. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roundtree
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardie Davis
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fennoy
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Williams
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Davis
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammie Sias
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Williams
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Hassan
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Frantom
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Garrett
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Williams
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Clarke
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odie Donald, II
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice McDowell
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie T. Walker
Represented By: Randolph Frails
Represented By: Tameka Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?