Cook v. Gains et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Cook
Defendant: Captain Gaines, Lieutenant Mr. Neal, Sergeant Ms. McAuthor, Sergeant Ms. Kemp, Jason Smith, Sergeant Mr. Moton, Warden Edward Philbin, Mr. Harman and Captain Gains
Case Number: 1:2021cv00161
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Marcus Cook. (ca)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcus Cook. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Agent by Marcus Cook. Responses due by 12/20/2021. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(kjm)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #8 Motion for the Court to appoint an agent; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS through and including December 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/3/2021. (ca)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Report and Recommendations filed by Marcus Cook. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (csr)
December 3, 2021 Reset Deadline as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2021. (ca)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint An Agent by Marcus Cook. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (csr)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing service re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/8/21. (loh)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge Dismissing Without Prejudice re #1 Complaint; Denying re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying re #5 MOTION to Avoid Plaintiff's Prior Complaints In Regard to his Claim in the Declaration. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/8/21. (loh)
November 8, 2021 Set/ResetDeadlines as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2021. (loh)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Avoid Plaintiff's Prior Complaints In Regard to his Claim in the Declaration by Marcus Cook. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION by Marcus Cook. (maa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Marcus Cook. (maa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Cook. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marcus Cook.(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Gains et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Mr. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Ms. McAuthor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Ms. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Mr. Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Edward Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Gains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?