Wynn v. Adams
Defendant: Warden Brian Adams and Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Petitioner: Donnie Lee Wynn
Case Number: 1:2021cv00162
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing service of the Magistrate Judge's #7 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2021. (csr)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 2254 Petition be Dismissed as untimely and this #1 civil action be Closed. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2021. (csr)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order. Unable to forward. Mail sent to Donnie Lee Wynn. (loh)
December 6, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number sav039980. (wwp)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court Directs Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/4/2021. (csr)
November 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/25/2021. (csr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Inmate Account Statement by Donnie Lee Wynn. (jlh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Donnie Lee Wynn. (gmh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donnie Lee Wynn. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(gmh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Donnie Lee Wynn. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibits)(gmh). Modified on 10/29/2021 (gmh). Modified on 11/1/2021 (JH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynn v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donnie Lee Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?