Williams et al v. Georgia Power et al
Plaintiff: Sean Williams and Janice Williams
Defendant: Georgia Power and ComTran Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00051
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 06/04/2024. (jlh)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss, directing the Clerk to terminate all motions and deadlines, if any, and close this case, and further directing the Clerk to serve a courtesy copy of this Order on the Clerk of the Superior Court of Taliaferro County. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/04/2024. (jlh)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Dismiss by Janice Williams, Sean Williams. Responses due by 5/20/2024. (gmh)
April 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Answer filed in State Court by ComTran Group Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Waddell, Kyle) Link added. Modified on 4/26/2024 (thb).
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Brandon Waddell on behalf of ComTran Group Inc. (Waddell, Kyle)
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Brandon Waddell on behalf of Georgia Power (Waddell, Kyle)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing service re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/25/24. (loh)
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the U.S. Magistrate Judge that re #1 Notice of Removal should be dismissed as frivolous, and this civil action should be closed. The Court also Reports and Recommends that this case should be remanded to the Superior Court of Taliaferro County. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/25/24. (loh)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/25/24. (loh)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. ComTran Group Inc. Answer due 4/30/2024. Notices to Appear due by 5/3/2024. Previously-filed Motions due by 5/7/2024. (gmh) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/23/2024) (kjm).
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/23/2024. (gmh)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janice Williams. Responses due by 5/7/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (gmh)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sean Williams, Janice Williams from Superior Court of Taliaferro County, case number 24CV0004. (Attachments: #1 Former Attorney's Demand Letter; Complaint and Request for Injunction; Colorado Disabled Person's Parking Placard; Department of Veterans Affairs Certification; Doctor's letter regarding medical necessity for window tint; Taliaferro County Sheriff's Office Miscellaneous Report regarding trespassing dated 1/28/2024; Taliaferro County Sheriff's Office Incident Report-Supplementals dated 2/5/2024; Photographs; Special Appearance Answer of Georgia Power Company with Exhibit A - Easement, Exhibit B - not readable, Exhibit C - Plat, Exhibit D - Easement; Defendant Georgia Power Company's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Superior Court of Taliaferro County Civil Action No. 24CV0010 Documents: Summons by Georgia Power Company; Rule NISI; Georgia Power Company's Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief with Exhibit A - Easement, Exhibit B - not readable, Exhibit C - Plat, Exhibit D - Easement, Exhibit E - Limited Warranty Deed; Verification of Matthew Scott Power; Georgia Power Company's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Interlocutory Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law; Verification of Matthew Scott Power) (gmh)
April 23, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: ComTran Group Inc. answer due 4/30/2024. (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Georgia Power et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Power
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ComTran Group Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?