Blochowicz v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Blochowicz
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland, Jill E. Steinberg, U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, QGC, U.S. Department of Justice and The United States
Case Number: 1:2024cv00076
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Blanchard on behalf of All Defendants (Blanchard, Jason)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #6 Motion to Stay Discovery. The Court STAYS all discovery in this action pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Strike. If the case is to continue after resolution of that motion, the parties shall confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report, with proposed case deadlines, within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/20/24. (loh)
June 13, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. (cmr)
June 13, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. (cmr)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 REMARK: Proof of Service, USPS Tracking, and United States Postal Service receipt. (jlh)
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #4 Order to Show Cause, filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. (loh)
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Merrick B. Garland, Jill E. Steinberg, The United States, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, QGC. Responses due by 6/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Statkus, Shannon)
May 31, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by Merrick B. Garland, Jill E. Steinberg, The United States, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, QGC. Responses due by 6/14/2024. (Statkus, Shannon)
May 31, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint. (csr)
May 31, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (csr)
May 31, 2024 Motions No Longer Referred: #5 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (cmr)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiff to respond, in writing, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, to show cause why these cases (CV124-064 and CV 124-076) should not be consolidated and to explain whether the instant complaint was intended to be filed as an amended complaint in CV 124-076. Show Cause Response due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/24/2024. Modified on 5/24/2024 (jlh).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/23/2024. (maa)
May 23, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Jill E. Steinberg, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, QGC. (maa)
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Jill E. Steinberg, The United States, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, QGC, filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa)
May 23, 2024 Filing fee: $405, receipt number 100001873. (maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blochowicz v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Blochowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill E. Steinberg
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, QGC
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?