Blochowicz v. The United States
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Blochowicz
Defendant: The United States; Jill E. Steinberg, The United States; U.S. Department of Justice, The United States; U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, OGC, The United States and The United States; Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 1:2024cv00084
Filed: June 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion to Stay by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. Responses due by 8/16/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. The Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/2/2024. (maa)
July 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Blanchard on behalf of All Defendants (Blanchard, Jason)
July 1, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Strike, filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. (loh)
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay, filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. (loh)
June 17, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint , #1 Complaint by The United States, The United States; Jill E. Steinberg, The United States; Merrick B. Garland, The United States; U.S. Department of Justice, The United States; U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, OGC. Responses due by 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Statkus, Shannon)
June 17, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by The United States, The United States; Jill E. Steinberg, The United States; Merrick B. Garland, The United States; U.S. Department of Justice, The United States; U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, OGC. Responses due by 7/1/2024. (Statkus, Shannon)
June 17, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint. (csr)
June 17, 2024 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (cmr)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 REMARK: Proof of Service re Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Service Remark: Civil Process Clerk, #2 Service Remark: Dept. of Justice, and #3 Service Remark: Dept. of Veterans Affairs.) (jlh)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that the CLERK attach a copy of Rule 4 to this Order so that Plaintiff may determine the appropriate method of service for each Defendant. The Court HEREBY NOTIFIES Plaintiff he must serve Defendants within ninety days after the complaint was filed, and failure to do so may result in the dismissal of individual Defendants or the entire case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/6/24. (wwp)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/4/2024. (gmh)
June 4, 2024 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to The United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gmh)
June 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States, filed by Jeffrey M. Blochowicz. Filing Fee paid, $405.00, Receipt #100001891. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blochowicz v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States; Jill E. Steinberg
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States; U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States; U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs, OGC
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States; Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Blochowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?