Edenfield et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carl Edenfield and Della Edenfield
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00154
Filed: September 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/15/24. (cjc)
October 15, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Walmart, Inc. for dates of : November 25, 2024 through November 29, 2024 (cmr)
October 14, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Walmart, Inc. for dates of : November 25, 2024 through November 29, 2024 by Walmart, Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deeb, Nicholas)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2024. Discovery due by 4/3/2025. Motions due by 8/1/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 4/3/2025. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 5/2/2025. Status Report due by 7/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/25/24. (loh)
September 19, 2024 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Deeb, Nicholas)
September 19, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
September 11, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Andrew Anderson, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Anderson, Dane)
September 9, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Leadership & Board of Directors)(Deeb, Nicholas)
September 9, 2024 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Leadership & Board of Directors)(Deeb, Nicholas)
September 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Elias Deeb on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Deeb, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2024: #1 Flattened Doc) (kjm).
September 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Walmart, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (FS Answer & Jury Demand) (Deeb, Nicholas)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/4/2024. (amd)
September 4, 2024 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record, re #1 Notice of Removal. (amd)
September 4, 2024 Set Deadlines: Walmart, Inc. answer due 9/10/2024. Compliance due by 9/14/2024, re #2 Notice. (amd)
September 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from the Superior Court of Columbia County, case number 2024ECV075. (Filing fee $405.00, receipt number AGASDC-3894395) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A and B, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edenfield et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edenfield
Represented By: Dane Andrew Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Edenfield
Represented By: Dane Andrew Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Elias Deeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?