Collins v. Peggy's Restaurant, LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Collins
Defendant: Peggy's Restaurant, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00160
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Peggy's Restaurant, LLC. Responses due by 9/27/2024. (Casey, Robert)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/9/2024. (amd)
September 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Davidson on behalf of Donna Collins (Davidson, Benjamin)
September 9, 2024 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record, re #1 Notice of Removal. (amd)
September 9, 2024 Set Deadlines: Peggy's Restaurant, LLC answer due 9/13/2024. (amd)
September 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peggy's Restaurant, LLC from the Superior Court of Jefferson County, case number 24SV0052. (Filing fee $405.00 receipt number AGASDC3896685), filed by Peggy's Restaurant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Peggy's Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Collins
Represented By: Benjamin C. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy's Restaurant, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?