Waddell v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Waddell
Defendant: Dr. Lee Larowe, Kyle Price and Deshawn Jones
Case Number: 1:2024cv00174
Filed: October 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2024 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Terrance Waddell. (jrb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/5/2024) (jrb).
November 5, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Terrance Waddell to collection of fees. (jrb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/5/2024) (jrb).
November 5, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Prisoner Account Statement and Consent to Collect Fees from Trust Fund Account by Terrance Waddell. Responses due by 11/19/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 11/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/7/24. (wwp)
October 3, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Terrance Waddell. (pts)
October 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Waddell. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (pts)
October 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terrance Waddell.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waddell v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee Larowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deshawn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?