Tweedy et al v. Superior Court of Richmond County State of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Cherri Tweedy and Rodney Tweedy
Defendant: Daniel J. Craig, Katherine Mason, Kimberly Reed, Rahmaan Bowick, Ebony Reed, Superior Court of Richmond County State of Georgia, Kennetta Reed, Ken Rogers and Jared T. Williams
Case Number: 1:2024cv00225
Filed: December 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to amend his Complaint within 30 days in accordance with the terms of this Order. PLRA due by 2/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/14/2025. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms, and #2 Prisoner Complaint Form.) (jlh)
January 14, 2025 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2025. (jlh)
January 6, 2025 Filing 4 AMENDED 2241 COMPLAINT against Rahmaan Bowick, Daniel J. Craig, Katherine Mason, Kennetta Reed, Kimberly Reed, Ken Rogers, Superior Court of Richmond County State of Georgia, Jared T. Williams, filed by Rodney Tweedy. (gmh)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to inform the Court by a written filing bearing the case caption above whether he intends to proceed with a 1983 complaint or a 2241 habeas corpus petition. The Court DIRECTS the CLERK to include an appropriate form civil rights complaint used by incarcerated litigants in the Southern District of Georgia and a form 2241 habeas corpus petition with Plaintiffs service copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/13/24. (loh)
December 13, 2024 Set/Reset Deadline: Compliance re #3 Order due by 12/27/2024. (loh)
December 11, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodney Tweedy. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp)
December 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rodney Tweedy.(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tweedy et al v. Superior Court of Richmond County State of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherri Tweedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Tweedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahmaan Bowick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Richmond County State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennetta Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?