v. Augusta Division
Defendant: Augusta Division
Case Number: 1:2025tc05000
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2025 Filing 15 CV125-035 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Chetankumar Patel v. Ur Jaddou . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4008348, $405(Chaudhary, Bhavya) Modified on 2/27/2025 (cmr).
February 26, 2025 Filing 14 CV125-034 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Excelsior Ambulance Service, Inc. v. Appointed Worldwide Holding, LLC . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4008248, $405(Scott, Paul) Modified on 2/26/2025 (cmr).
February 26, 2025 Filing 13 CV125-032 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Holden Blackwell v. CSX Transportation, Inc. . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4007995, $405(Wilkes, Alisa) Modified on 2/26/2025 (cmr).
February 18, 2025 Filing 12 CV125-028 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Removal Kimberly O'Bryan v. James B. Ellington . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-4003225, $405(Price, John) Modified on 2/19/2025 (cmr).
February 4, 2025 Filing 11 CV125-026 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Removal Angela Brown v. Arthur Slater, et al. . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3991068, $405(Beaton, Anna) Modified on 2/4/2025 (cmr).
February 3, 2025 Filing 10 CV125-025 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Cameron Sizemore v. ADT LLC . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3989957, $405(Billips, Matthew) Modified on 2/3/2025 (cmr).
February 3, 2025 Filing 9 CV125-024 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Rodger Rice v. Jacobson Transportation, Inc. . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3989559, $405(Dekle, David) Modified on 2/3/2025 (cmr).
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 CV125-021 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - EBONY DANCY v. CREDENCE RESOURCE MANAGEMENT, LLC . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3988153, $405(Berry, Matthew) Modified on 1/31/2025 (cmr).
January 22, 2025 Filing 7 CV125-016 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue -Complaint - JOINER v. CORRECTHEALTH, LLC et al.. Fee paid: Receipt # BGASDC-3982478, $405(Jones, Craig) Modified on 1/23/2025 (thb).
January 17, 2025 Filing 6 CV125-014 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Mark E. Stevens and Gina M. Stevens . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3979202, $405(Crow, Nikole) Modified on 1/21/2025 (cmr).
January 16, 2025 Filing 5 CV125-013 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - JERI-MICHEL DUNCAN v. BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF GREATER AUGUSTA, INC. . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3977588, $405(Brookhuis, Amanda) Modified on 1/16/2025 (cmr).
January 14, 2025 Filing 4 CV125-010 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint (IFP) - LaWanda Jones v. Carolyn Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security (Piemonte, George) Modified on 1/14/2025 (cmr).
January 9, 2025 Filing 3 CV125-005 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Kadarius Cheatham v. Kyler Fern, individually, Dia'Monte Oneal, Individuallym Gerardo Sanchez Jr., individually, Wayne Cuyler, individually, and Karen Geeting, individually . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3971042, $405(Funt, Samantha) Modified on 1/10/2025 (cmr).
January 9, 2025 Filing 2 CV125-004 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Removal Conswello Moore v. Benjamin Smith, L&B3 Trucking LLC, and Southwind Risk Retention Group, Inc. Notice of Removal. Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3970978, $405(Sessions, Matthew) Modified on 1/10/2025 (cmr).
January 7, 2025 Filing 1 CV125-003 Hall/Epps assigned and uploaded to the pleadings queue - Complaint - Removal CSRA PROBATION SERVICES, INC. v. ERTC EXPRESS, LLC . Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3969188, $405(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 1/8/2025 (cmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Augusta Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?