Agnone et al v. Camden County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Agnone, Enzo Agnone, Douglas Porcelli, Cynthia Porcelli, Bridge Pointe at Jekyll Sound Community Association, Inc., Jitendra Hirani, Carlos E. Calvo, Monica B. Nunez De Calvo, Yogesh Patel, Ananta Patel, Ralph H. Petrella, Tomi J. Petrella, Jamie Barnard, Mark Zurawel, Francis G. O'Such, Valerie D. O'Such, Millicent Harwell-Cross, Brian A. Donovan, Steven Sanders, William D. Turner, Cheryle W. Turner, Rick A. Nutcher, Robert J. Bisnett, Carol Ann Bisnett, Richard W. Garrison, Beryl K. Garrison, Michael B. Randall, Alex S. Paulson, Robert W. Wilhelm, Roxanne M. Wilhelm, Michael Danyus, Victor Hernandez, Maria Vega, Greg E. Murphy, Debra E. Murphy, Laura Donovan, Daniel D. Veal, Elizabeth B. Veal, John P. Glish, Barbara K. Glish, Marilyn Militscher, Cassandra R. Bowen, Joshua S. Bowen, John Murphey, Laura Murphey, Jeanne Steinebrunner, Bernd Steinebrunner, Lidia Penalver, Dennis H. Thomas, Peggy E. Thomas, Michael A. Scott, Equity Trust Company Custodian, Vincent Salierno, Deborah Salierno, BPJSCA, Inc., David Lewis, James C. Heller, Kathleen A. Heller, Dale Ellis, James Conrad Bishop, Raymond Prescottano, Len A. Carter, Clifford W. O'Neill, Pamela A. O'Neill, David Bishop, Eva Bishop, Edward Wojciechowski, Ann Marie Wojciechowski, James M. Corcoran, Dennis Vaccaro, Janet Vaccaro, Warren Mueger, Eve Mueger, Daniel K. Harshman, Henry Huey, Palm Tree Partners, Curt L. Riggen, Robert Bock, Diane Bock, Fiserv & Co., Michael Wagner, David L. Emerson, Cynthia Joanne Emerson, John Kazmerski, John H. Cherry, III, Phyllis A. Cherry, Rosanna D. Clark, NUVIEW IRA, Louis Karvonidis, Andy Rosolinski, Kate Zaluski, Robert L. English, Jr., Nancy T. English, Timothy J. Walkley, Susan M. Walkley, Marla Scherker, Marcia Rudderman, Doug Metcalfe, Karen Metcalfe, Dean Befumo, Jeffrey Wienand, Sr., Edward J. Kulik, Pamela M. Kulik, Barbara Zolli, Lawrence O'Hern, Jr., Jeff Thomas, E. Kipp Echols, Allen W. Barley, Dorinda J. Barley, Robert Carpentier, Donna Carpentier, Nicholas Franco, John A. King, Erminio Torello, Rita Torello, Jack Lupas, Peter Cavaliere, Frederick W. Heidtman, Adrienne Heidtman, Dallen Atack, Kimber Atack, Andrew J. Seeley, Sean P. Seeley, Alfonso DeRosa, III, George S. Merlo, Georgianne Merlo, Thomas Trainor, Kristen N. Befumo, John T. Bollinger, Jr., Patricia Nunez, Joseph N. Murdock, Margie A. Murdock, William Moorhead, Carol Moorhead, Heidi Ruff, Douglas Windsor, Joanne Windsor, Walter W. Hoff, Jeanette S. Ray, Robert Hileman, Cindy Hileman, Joseph E. Flynn, Jean Flynn, Catherine Cruz, Richard E. Mumford, Sally Mumford, Allen M. Seeley, Joan M. Seeley, Joseph Shanahan, Susan Shanahan, James Pace, Jacqueline Pace, Eric Lee, Lai-Fong Lee, Nicole Lam, Michael B. Sullivan, Pamela Manos Petkas, Arif Suwandi, Jennifer Jung, Andrew Michael Petkas, Neil Arthur Kain, III, Kathy Penn, Hugh Penn, Kevin Vogt, Emily Vogt, Philip C. Krebs, Aylin M. Kerbs, Sena Properties, LLC, Sarita Hirani, Ching-Kang Chen, Yu-Jiun Chen, David L. Russell, Harriet T. Russell, Michael O'Connell, Carol O'Connell, Neil Patel, Kenneth Kringle, Iva Kringle, David Preston Bush, B. David Richardson, Bradley S. Shepherd, Joseph B. Manderson, John L. Aitkens, Jr., Richard M. Taylor, Mark W. Carson, D. B. Richardson, Jr., Moody Williams, Deborah Villm, Paul B. Roy, Tammy R. Roy, Joseph P. Chanely, Marilyn A. Chanley, Dana K. Huie, Jeanette E. Huie, Nancy A. Hodge, David L. Carlberg and Jean M. Carlberg
Defendant: Camden County, Georgia, Willis R. Keene, Jr., Jimmy Starline, Chuck Clark, Tony Sheppard, Gary Blount, David L. Rainer, Katherine Nisi Zell, Charlene Sears, Stephen L. Berry, Stephen L. Howard, O. Brent Green, John McDill, David Keating and Scott Brazell
Case Number: 2:2014cv00024
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to Lexon Insurance Company. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/24/19. (wwp)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 123 . Motion for Class Representative Service Awards and Class Counsel Attorney's Fees and Expenses 96 is denied as moot. Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement, Amended Request for Attorney s' Fees and Service Awards, as supplemented, and Petition for Approval of Qualified Settlement Fund 110 , 111 , 112 , 117 are granted. The Court finally certifies the class action, finally approves the class settlement. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 4/10/19. (slt)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER directing service of the 123 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 03/26/2019. (jlh)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ADOPTING 102 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as its opinion, GRANTS Plaintiff's 78 Motion to Certify Class, 82 , 84 and 91 Motions for Settlement, CERTIFIES the class action, and PRELIMINARY APPROVES the class settlement on the terms and conditions set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/11/2018. (ca)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 82 Supplemental MOTION for Settlement - Preliminary Approval, 78 MOTION to Certify Class , 84 Supplemental MOTION for Settlement (Second Supplement to Motion for Preliminary App roval of Class Settlement and For Certification of Settlement Class), 91 Supplemental MOTION for Settlement Third Supplement to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class be granted on the modified terms and conditions set forth below. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/10/2018. (pts)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting the parties' request re the 89 Status Report to file revised papers concerning the request for preliminary approval of class settlement and certificate of settlement. The parties are directed to file their revised submission on the record by September 25, 2018. (Compliance due by 9/25/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/21/2018. (jlh)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE ORDER as to Lexon Insurance Company. (wwp)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order re 37 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery and Postpone the Filing of the Rule 26(f) Report. (Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/25/2016. (ca)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed until the Intervenors' claims have been resolved in the matter of Camden County v. Lexon, CV214-20. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/6/2015. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agnone et al v. Camden County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Agnone
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enzo Agnone
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Porcelli
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Porcelli
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridge Pointe at Jekyll Sound Community Association, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jitendra Hirani
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Calvo
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica B. Nunez De Calvo
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yogesh Patel
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ananta Patel
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph H. Petrella
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomi J. Petrella
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Barnard
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Zurawel
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis G. O'Such
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie D. O'Such
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent Harwell-Cross
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Donovan
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Sanders
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Turner
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryle W. Turner
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick A. Nutcher
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Bisnett
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Bisnett
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Garrison
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beryl K. Garrison
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Randall
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex S. Paulson
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Wilhelm
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne M. Wilhelm
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Danyus
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Hernandez
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vega
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg E. Murphy
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra E. Murphy
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Donovan
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel D. Veal
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth B. Veal
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Glish
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara K. Glish
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Militscher
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra R. Bowen
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua S. Bowen
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Murphey
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Murphey
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Steinebrunner
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernd Steinebrunner
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Penalver
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis H. Thomas
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy E. Thomas
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Scott
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Trust Company Custodian
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Salierno
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Salierno
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPJSCA, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lewis
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Heller
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Heller
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Ellis
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Conrad Bishop
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Prescottano
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Len A. Carter
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford W. O'Neill
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela A. O'Neill
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bishop
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Bishop
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Wojciechowski
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Wojciechowski
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Corcoran
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Vaccaro
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Vaccaro
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Mueger
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Mueger
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel K. Harshman
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Huey
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Tree Partners
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt L. Riggen
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bock
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Bock
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiserv & Co.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wagner
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Emerson
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Joanne Emerson
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kazmerski
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Cherry, III
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis A. Cherry
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanna D. Clark
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NUVIEW IRA
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Karvonidis
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Rosolinski
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Zaluski
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. English, Jr.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy T. English
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Walkley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Walkley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Scherker
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Rudderman
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Metcalfe
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Metcalfe
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Befumo
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wienand, Sr.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Kulik
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M. Kulik
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Zolli
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence O'Hern, Jr.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Thomas
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Kipp Echols
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen W. Barley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorinda J. Barley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carpentier
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Carpentier
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Franco
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. King
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erminio Torello
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Torello
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Lupas
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Cavaliere
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W. Heidtman
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Heidtman
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallen Atack
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimber Atack
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Seeley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean P. Seeley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso DeRosa, III
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S. Merlo
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgianne Merlo
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Trainor
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen N. Befumo
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Bollinger, Jr.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Nunez
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph N. Murdock
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie A. Murdock
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moorhead
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Moorhead
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Ruff
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Windsor
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Windsor
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter W. Hoff
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette S. Ray
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hileman
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Hileman
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Flynn
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Flynn
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Cruz
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Mumford
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Mumford
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen M. Seeley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M. Seeley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Shanahan
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Shanahan
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pace
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Pace
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lee
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lai-Fong Lee
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lam
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Sullivan
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Manos Petkas
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arif Suwandi
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jung
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Michael Petkas
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Arthur Kain, III
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Penn
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Penn
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Vogt
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Vogt
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip C. Krebs
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aylin M. Kerbs
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sena Properties, LLC
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarita Hirani
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ching-Kang Chen
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu-Jiun Chen
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Russell
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet T. Russell
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Connell
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol O'Connell
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Patel
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kringle
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iva Kringle
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Preston Bush
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. David Richardson
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley S. Shepherd
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B. Manderson
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Aitkens, Jr.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Taylor
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Carson
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B. Richardson, Jr.
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moody Williams
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Villm
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B. Roy
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy R. Roy
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Chanely
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn A. Chanley
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana K. Huie
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette E. Huie
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A. Hodge
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Carlberg
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean M. Carlberg
Represented By: Teresa T. Aitkens
Represented By: John B. Austin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden County, Georgia
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis R. Keene, Jr.
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Starline
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Clark
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Sheppard
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Blount
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Rainer
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Nisi Zell
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Sears
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Berry
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Howard
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Brent Green
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McDill
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Keating
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brazell
Represented By: G. Todd Carter
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?