Simpson v. Cooksey et al
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Simpson
Defendant: Ferrell Cooksey, Wayne County School System Board of Education, Wayne County School System, Justin McDonald, James Brinson, Krenwick Sanders and Rasheen Holmes
Case Number: 2:2014cv00128
Filed: August 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting joint 24 Motion of Dismissal with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(ii) and (c) of the Fed.R.Civ.P., as to the Wayne County Defendants only. Each party shall bear their own costs and expenses of litigation. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/3/2016. (ca)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting consent 15 Motion to Amend/Correct; Motion for Leave to File; Motion to Substitute Party. Wayne County School District added. Wayne County School System dismissed without prejudice; granting consent 16 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/3/2015. (ca)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 8/27/2014. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Cooksey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Simpson
Represented By: Marvin A. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrell Cooksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County School System Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krenwick Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasheen Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?