Stevens v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Rayford Stevens
Defendant: United States, Peter Libero, McManus, B. Aremu, Moon and S. Armfield
Case Number: 2:2014cv00178
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration, and denying 75 & 78 Motions for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/19/2017. (csr)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 61 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court and OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objections. The Court GRANTS Defendants' 39 Motion to Dismiss, DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint, and DISMISSES as moot Defendants' 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court also DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case and DENIES Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/28/2017. (csr)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANTS 39 Defendants' Motion, DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's 1 Complaint, and DIRECT the Clerk of Court to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and CLOSE t his case. It is also RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS as moot Defendants' pending 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DENY Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/10/2017. (csr)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Reconsideration re 27 Order on Motion to Set Expert Disclosure Deadlines and 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/16/2016. (ca)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Defendants' 32 Motion to Compel and 32 Motion for Costs Associated with Plaintiff's Failure to Participate in His Deposition. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to provide Defendants' counsel with responses to their discov ery request within ten (10) days from the date of this Order. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to reimburse Defendants in the amount of $202.18, payable to the U.S. Attorney's Office of the SDGA, for the costs associated with the failed depositio n attempt. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to participate fully in any deposition Defendants' counsel my schedule in this case. The Court DEFFERS ruling on Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff shall notify the Court within fourteen (14) days of this Order whether he successfully retained legal representation in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/12/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayford Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Libero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Aremu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Armfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?