Taylor v. Forsyth et al
Plaintiff: Terry N. Taylor
Defendant: Melisa Combs Forsyth, P.G. Rienhard, Richard A. Posner, Frank H. Easterbrook, Rosemary Collins, Terrance Lichtenward, Gino J. Agnello and Diane P. Woods
Case Number: 2:2015cv00106
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 27 , 28 , 29 , and 31 Motions for Reconsideration. The Court's Orders dated 8/26/15, 12/4/15, and 3/14/16, dtk. nos. 7, 13, 25, shall remain the Orders of the Court, and this case shall remain closed. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/10/2016. (ca)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge, as amended herein, as the opinion of the Court. Plaintiff's Objections are SUSTAINED as to Defendant Forsyth but are otherwise OVERRULED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISM ISSED, and the pending Motions are DISMISSED as not. The Clerk is DIRECETED to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. Plaintiff is DENIED in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/14/2016. (ca)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS all of the Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants re 1 Complaint filed by Terry N. Taylor. I further RECOMMEND that all pending Motions be DISMISSED as moot and that Plaintiff be DENIED in forma pauperis status on appeal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ORDERED to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDTION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/5/2016. Modified on 1/5/2016 (ca).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Forsyth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry N. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melisa Combs Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.G. Rienhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank H. Easterbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Lichtenward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino J. Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane P. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?