Golden v. Coldwell et al
Petitioner: Allen P. Golden
Respondent: Antoine Coldwell and Samuel S. Olens
Case Number: 2:2015cv00178
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Certificate of Appealability, and denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is DIRECTED to cause a copy of this Order to be served on Golden. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/13/2017. (csr)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 23 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court and OVERRULES Golden's Objections. The Court GRANTS Respondent's 11 Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSES as moot Golden's 19 Moti on for Summary Judgment. The Court also DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Additionally, the Court DENIES Golden in forma pauperis status on appeal and a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/20/2017. (csr)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/19/2016. (csr)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Respondents make answer in writing to the allegations of the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Allen P. Golden, by filing same with the Clerk within sixty (60) days after service of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/6/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden v. Coldwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen P. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antoine Coldwell
Represented By: Clint Christopher Malcolm
Represented By: Paula K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Samuel S. Olens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?