Timbes v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Timbes and Pamela M. Timbes
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Aldridge Pite, LLP and Aldridge Conners
Case Number: 2:2016cv00031
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Judgment of the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals is made the judgment of this Court. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/11/2017. (csr)
December 7, 2017 Filing 28 MANDATE of USCA - See Doc #27 as to #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Pamela M. Timbes. (ca)
September 7, 2017 Filing 27 Appeal Opinion re #24 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. (ca)
February 8, 2017 F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re #24 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (ca)
February 8, 2017 Filing 26 USCA Case Number 17-10556-C for #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Pamela M. Timbes. (ca)
February 2, 2017 Filing 25 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #24 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: Chief Judge Lisa Godbey Wood. Court Reporter: No hearing. Fee Paid: Yes. Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 ROA)(ca)
February 2, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Dismiss, #23 Judgment by Pamela M. Timbes. Filing fee $ 505, BWK006979. (ca)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to #22 Order dated 1/13/17, granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/20/2017. (ca)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Remand to State Court and Motion to Stay. Defendant Deutsche Bank's #6 Motion to Dismiss and Aldridge Pite's #10 Motion to Dismiss are granted. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter the appropriate judgment and to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/13/2017. (ca) Modified on 1/17/2017 (ca).
September 12, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Viraj Prashant Deshmukh on behalf of Aldridge Pite, LLP. (Deshmukh, Viraj)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendants' #18 Motion to Stay Discovery. All proceedings are stayed pending a ruling by the Court on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days following the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, should this case remain pending before the Court, the parties are directed to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f). Additionally, the parties are to file a Rule 26(f) Report within fourteen days of the Rule 26(f) conference at which time a Scheduling Order will be entered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/19/2016. (csr)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Marlee Waxelbaum. Matthew R. Brooks has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on March 17, 2016. (pmh)
March 17, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Discovery and Memorandum of Law in Support. (csr)
March 17, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Discovery and Memorandum of Law in Support by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 4/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Matthew)
March 14, 2016 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION to Stay filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Brooks, Matthew)
March 14, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION to Stay filed by Aldridge Pite, LLP. (Ivey, Dallas) Modified on 3/14/2016. (csr)
March 10, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Marlee Waxelbaum, Esquire. (csr)
March 10, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Marlee Waxelbaum. $200.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number 113J-1946990 filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 3/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing from NDGa, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C - Proposed Order of Admission)(Brooks, Matthew). Modified on 3/10/2016. (csr)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Dallas R. Ivey. Jason Jones has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on March 10, 2016. (pmh)
March 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/23/2016 re: #13 Deficiency Notice. (csr)
March 9, 2016 Filing 13 Deficiency Notice re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by Dallas R. Ivey, Esquire. (csr)
March 8, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by Dallas R. Ivey. (csr)
March 8, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by Aldridge Pite, LLP re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-1945337, Fee Amount $200, (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Pursuant to LP 83.4(b)(2))(Jones, L.)
March 8, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by Dallas. $200.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number 113J-1945337, filed by Aldridge Pite, LLP. Responses due by 3/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Jones, L.). Modified on 3/9/2016. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2016: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (csr).
March 8, 2016 Filing 10 ******* MOTION to Dismiss by Aldridge Pite, LLP. Responses due by 3/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jones, L.) Modified on 3/9/2016. (csr)
March 8, 2016 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Aldridge Pite, LLP. (Jones, L.)
March 8, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance with deficiency notice #8 due by 3/22/2016. (slt)
March 8, 2016 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re: pro hac vice motions. (slt)
March 2, 2016 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation & Deutsche Bank AG as Corporate Parent. (Brooks, Matthew)
March 2, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 3/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Security Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - BK Dismissal Order, #4 Exhibit D - Foreclosure Notice, #5 Exhibit E - FDCPA Letters)(Brooks, Matthew)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand and MOTION to Stay ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss by Pamela M. Timbes. Responses due by 3/17/2016. (slt)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/25/16. (slt)
February 25, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Continuation of Exhibits. All parties are notified to re-file any pending motions (previously filed in state court), and responses, within 14 days of the date of this notice. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/10/2016. (slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2016: #1 email to plaintiff and to counsel of record) (slt).
February 24, 2016 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and Aldridge Pite, LLP. (Attachments: Exhibit A part 5 - Aldridge Pite LLP brief in support of motion to dismiss, #1 Exhibit A part 6 - Aldridge Pite LLP answer & exh 1 - 4, #2 Exhibit A part 7 - Aldridge Pite LLP answer exh 5 and 6, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit B - notice to Superior Court)(slt) Modified on 3/7/2016 (slt).
February 24, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Aldridge Pite, LLP, from Superior Court of Glynn County, case number CE16-00001-063. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113J-1938214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 - complaint, #2 Exhibit A part 2 - petition for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction, #3 Exhibit A part 3 - amended complaint, #4 Exhibit A part 4 - Aldridge Pite LLP motion to dismiss, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (slt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timbes v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M. Timbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Matthew R. Brooks
Represented By: Marlee Waxelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Brooks
Represented By: Marlee Waxelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldridge Pite, LLP
Represented By: Viraj Prashant Deshmukh
Represented By: L. Jason Jones
Represented By: Dallas R. Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldridge Conners
Represented By: Viraj Prashant Deshmukh
Represented By: L. Jason Jones
Represented By: Dallas R. Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?