Adigun v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Loretta C. Adigun
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00039
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying Plaintiff Loretta C. Adigun's 71 Motion for Reconsideration re 69 Order on Motion for Reconsideration ; granting Defendant's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter the appropriate judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 11/21/2017. (ca)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Defendant's 72 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/7/2017. (csr)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/15/2017. (csr)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/30/2017. (csr)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Protective Order from Deposition and ORDERS Plaintiff to appear for her properly noticed deposition on March 23, 2017, at the offices of Gilbert & Jones Court Reporters in Brunswick, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/10/2017. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adigun v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta C. Adigun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?