Bable v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Eric Bable
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv00068
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 15 . The motion to vacate is denied. Leave to appeal in forma pauperis and a certificate of appealability are denied. Clerk is directed to close case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/31/17. (slt)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Lifting Stay re: 9 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/18/2017. (csr)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Bable's 5 Motion to Hold in Abeyance pending the Supreme Court's Decision. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in Case Number 2:16-cv-68 are STAYED until the Supreme Court issues a decision in the Beckles case. The Government shall file a Revised Response to Bable's § 2255 Motion within twenty-one (21) days of the Supreme Court's issuance of an opinion in Beckles. Bable may file a Reply to the Government's Revised Response within twenty-one (21) days of the Government's Revised Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/6/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bable v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Bable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: Karl Irving Knoche
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?