The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of TSI Tri-State Painting, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of TSI Tri-State Painting, LLC
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00113
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying TSI's partial 130 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Federal's 132 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are Ordered to file their proposed pretrial order by July 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/9/2022. (ca)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 129 Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Michael Harris. Harris is otherwise permitted to testify, including on his independent conclusions regarding containment delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 01/13/2022. (jlh)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Defendant Federal Insurance Company's 8 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay this Action. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/20/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of TSI Tri-State Painting, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of TSI Tri-State Painting, LLC
Represented By: John D. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: George D. Wenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?