Dixon v. King and Prince Seafood Corporation
Plaintiff: LaDarrelle Rhamek Dixon
Defendant: King and Prince Seafood Corporation, Micheal Alexander, William Frazier and John Bache
Case Number: 2:2016cv00127
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 9 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court and OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objections. The Court DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Reliastar Life Insuran ce Company and Voya Financial and all of Plaintiff's putative state law claims. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Title VII and Americans with Disabilities Act claims due to his failure to state a claim. The Court also DENIES Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter an appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/24/2017. (csr)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Reliastar Life Insurance Company ("Reliastar") and Voya Financial ("Voya") and all of Plaintiff 's putative state law claims. The Court should also DISMISS all of Plaintiff's Title VII and Americans with Disabilities Act claims for failure to state a claim. Additionally, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Plaintiff leave to appea l in forma pauperis and DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case re: 1 Complaint. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/6/2017. (csr)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/14/2016. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. King and Prince Seafood Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDarrelle Rhamek Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King and Prince Seafood Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?