Dever v. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia D. Dever
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC and Darryl Martin
Case Number: 2:2017cv00019
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Substitution and Remand. The Clerk is instructed to REMAND this case back to the State Court of Glynn County. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/3/2018. (csr)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Defendant Martin's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Family Dollar's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/20/2017. (ca)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiff Patricia Dever's 15 Motion to Substitute and Remand. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/20/2017. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dever v. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia D. Dever
Represented By: Charles R. Adams, III
Represented By: Kim Mark Minix
Represented By: Mark G. Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: James T. Hankins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Martin
Represented By: James T. Hankins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?