BLB Construction, Inc. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BLB Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00102
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Murphy, Maureen)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave of Absence by Maureen E. Murphy for the dates of November 21, 2018, through and including December 3, 2018; and December 21, 2018, through and including January 7, 2019. However, due to the amount of time in which she will be unavailable, Ms. Murphy must ensure co-counsel's availability in the event the case is scheduled for hearing or trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 11, 2018. (edd)
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Murphy, Maureen)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 Litigants' Bill of Rights by BLB Construction, Inc. (Roberts, James) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Corrected PDF) (ca).
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by BLB Construction, Inc. (Roberts, James) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jlh).
October 5, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (ca)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Maureen)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave of Absence by Michael Kendall for the dates of November 14, 2018, through and including November 28, 2018; and December 21, 2018, through and including January 2, 2019. However, due to the amount of time in which he will be unavailable, Mr. Kendall must ensure co-counsel's availability in the event the case is scheduled for hearing or trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 5, 2018. (edd)
October 4, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (ca)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company for dates of : November 14, 2018 through and including November 28, 2018; December 21, 2018 through and including January 2, 2019 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Murphy, Maureen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Roberts, IV on behalf of BLB Construction, Inc. (Roberts, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Notice to All Counsel of Record. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/4/2018. (ca)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Maureen E. Murphy. Daniel J. Conner, Jr. has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 20, 2018. (km)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael C. Kendall. Daniel J. Conner, Jr. has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 20, 2018. (km)
September 18, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (ca)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2449465, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing for Maureen E. Murphy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Conner, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2449455, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing for Michael C. Kendall, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Conner, Daniel)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Litigant's Bill of Rights due by 9/26/2018. (ca)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to file the Litigant's Bill of Rights up to and including 9/26/18. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/7/2018. (ca)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Conner, Daniel)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to File Litigant's Bill of Rights by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conner, Daniel)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Conner, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (ca)
August 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Auto-Owners Insurance Company answer due 9/6/2018. (csr)
August 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance due by 9/9/2018. Re-file any Pending Motions Previously Filed due by 9/13/2018. (csr)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/30/2018. (csr)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Superior Court of Camden County, Georgia, case number SUCV2018000593. ( Filing fee paid on 8/30/2018 - $400.00; receipt number 113J-2438437). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Bad Faith Pursuant to O.C.G.A. 33-4-6 and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Brunswick Division, #4 Supplement Notice of Filing Removal; Exhibit A and B, #5 Supplement Certificate, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLB Construction, Inc. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLB Construction, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Roberts, IV
Represented By: Theresa Davis Beaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Conner, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen E. Murphy
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?